EP1721234 - THREAT MITIGATION IN COMPUTER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB | [2011/23] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Qinetiq Limited Registered Office, 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYATT, Graham, Richard QINETIQ LIMITED Malvern Technology Centre,St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | 02 /
DEAN, Timothy, Barry QINETIQ LIMITED Malvern Technology Centre,St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Tocher, Alastair James, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road, Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Tocher, Alastair James, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Tocher, Alastair James QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough, Hants GU14 0LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05717807.1 | 28.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005GB00726 | Priority number, date | GB20040004517 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0404517 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085971 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721234 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G06F21/50 (EP,US);
G06F21/6236 (EP,US);
H04L63/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDROHUNGSVERMINDERUNG IN COMPUTERNETZEN | [2006/46] | English: | THREAT MITIGATION IN COMPUTER NETWORKS | [2006/46] | French: | LIMITATION DES RISQUES DE MENACE DANS DES RESEAUX D'ORDINATEURS | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 27.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/09] | 09.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10235819 (SCHNEIDER UTZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0002] , [0031] - [0036] *; | [X]DE10023249 (MARTENS JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] *; | [X]US2003120812 (NITTA TETSUJI [JP]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0052] *; | [X]US2003188196 (CHOI JEONG-HWAN [KR]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] *; | [A] - MARCOLINI M, "ERWEITERTER ZUGANGSSCHUTZ BEIM DATEIAUSTAUSCH", TELCOM REPORT, SIEMENS AG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19880701), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 0344-4724, pages 150 - 152, XP000048568 [A] 1-21 * page 3 * | Examination | - "Portable Document Format", (20040228), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Portable_Document_Format&oldid=2595868, (20120229), XP055020612 | - PDF Reference, Addiso- Wesley, (20000731), ISBN 0-201-61588-6 | - "DMZ (computing)", (20030801), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=DMZ_%28computing%29&oldid=3651642, (20120229), XP055020611 | by applicant | DE10235819 | US2003120812 |