EP1723052 - A FLUID DISPENSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNEY, Stanley George, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | 02 /
CONNELL, Hugh Alexander 8 Brookdale,Harvington Evesham, Worcestershire WR11 8ND / GB | 03 /
DAVIES, Michael Birsha, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | 04 /
GODFREY, James William, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | 05 /
HEDLEY, Mark Graham, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | 06 /
TANSLEY, Robert W., Warwick Design Consultant Ltd. 12 Waterloo Park Estate Bidford on Avon, Warwickshire B50 4JH / GB | [2011/47] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
BONNEY, Stanley George, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | ||
02 /
CONNELL, Hugh Alexander 8 Brookdale,Harvington Evesham, Worcestershire WR11 8ND / GB | |||
03 /
DAVIES, Michael Birsha, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | |||
04 /
GODFREY, James William, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | |||
05 /
HEDLEY, Mark Graham, GlaxoSmithKline Park Road Ware, Hertfordshire SG12 0DP / GB | |||
06 /
TANSLEY, Robert W., Warwick Design Consultant Ltd. 12 Waterloo Park Estate Bidford on Avon, Warwickshire B50 4JH / GB | Representative(s) | Rice, Jason Neale GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN 925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Rice, Jason Neale GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Rice, Jason Neale GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property, 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05718003.6 | 10.03.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005GB00944 | Priority number, date | GB20040005477 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: GB 0405477 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087615 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723052 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723052 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14, B05B11/00, A61M15/08 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61M11/08 (EP,NO,US);
A61M15/08 (KR);
B05B11/1059 (EP,US);
B05B11/00 (KR);
B05B11/0037 (NO);
B05B11/1052 (EP,NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | HR | 04.09.2006 | LV | 04.09.2006 | Title | German: | FLUIDABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2006/47] | English: | A FLUID DISPENSING DEVICE | [2006/47] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE LIQUIDE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/35] | EE | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4860738 (HEGEMANN MANFRED K [US], et al) [X] 30-34,37-41 * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 33 * * figures 6-8 * [A] 1; | [XA]FR2671294 (SAVONA JEAN LOUIS [FR], et al) [X] 37-41 * the whole document * [A] 1,30; | [XA]US5899365 (EICHLER GERD [DE], et al) [X] 30-34,37-41 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [X]WO9949984 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 52,53 * page 7, lines 11-15 * * page 7, lines 28,29 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 8 * * figure - *; | [I]US6305371 (FRID PER [SE], et al) [I] 48,49,51 * column 1, lines 43-57 * * column 3, lines 15-55 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2812826 (VALOIS SA [FR]) [A] 1-29 * page 6, line 9 - page 9, line 10; figure - *; | [XA]WO0220168 (VALOIS SA [FR], et al) [X] 30-41 * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 12 * * figures 3-6 * [A] 1; | [I]US6382205 (WEINSTEIN ROBERT E [US], et al) [I] 48-51 * column 3, lines 58-61 * * column 4, lines 34-45 * * figure - *; | [X]US2002170928 (GRYCHOWSKI JERRY [US], et al) [X] 42-47,52,53 * page 7, paragraph 133 - page 8, paragraph 139; figures 38,39 * * page 14, paragraph 185 *; | [DX]WO03095007 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-29 * pages 11-14; figures 1,2a,3 * * pages 33-34; figures 19,19a,19b * * pages 35-36; figures 22-24 *; | [PX]WO2004080606 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-46 * page 44, line 1 - page 46, line 19 * * figures 24a-24e *; | [E]WO2005028007 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-29 * page 26, line 25 - page 28, line 25 * * claim - ** figures 8a,8b,9a,9b * |