EP1763595 - ALUMINIUM ELECTROWINNING CELLS WITH NON-CARBON ANODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 1188, Sherbrooke Street West Montreal, QC H3A 3G2 / CA | [2010/47] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states MOLTECH Invent S.A. 6, rue Adolphe Fisher 1520 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Thinh T. Rte du Grand-Lancy 165b CH-1213 Onex / CH | 02 /
DE NORA, Vittorio Immeuble Fontanettes B CH-3968 Veyras / CH | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Malcoiffe, Julien, et al Rio Tinto France SAS 725, rue Aristide Bergès BP 25 Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | [2012/17] |
Former [2010/47] | Mérigeault, Thierry Louis Henri, et al ALCAN France SAS 725 Rue Aristide Bergès BP 25 Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/32] | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2007/12] | Cronin, Brian Harold John c/o Moltech S.A., Quai du Mont-Blanc 21 1201 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 05718283.4 | 18.03.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005IB00788 | Priority number, date | WO2004IB00886 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: PCT/IB2004/000886 | WO2004IB01416 | 29.04.2004 Original published format: PCT/IB2004/001416 | WO2004IB01024 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: PCT/IB2004/001024 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005090642 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763595 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/08, C25C3/18 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
C25C3/18 (EP,US);
C25C3/08 (EP,US);
C25C3/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | C25C3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLEN ZUR ELEKTROLYTISCHEN GEWINNUNG VON ALUMINIUM MIT NICHTKOHLENSTOFFANODEN | [2007/12] | English: | ALUMINIUM ELECTROWINNING CELLS WITH NON-CARBON ANODES | [2007/12] | French: | CELLULES D'EXTRACTION ELECTROLYTIQUE D'ALUMINIUM COMPRENANT DES ANODES EXEMPTES DE CARBONE | [2011/18] |
Former [2007/12] | CELLULES D'EXTRACTION LECTROLYTIQUE D'ALUMINIUM ANODES EXEMPTES DE CARBONE | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4956068 (NGUYEN THINH [CH], et al) [A] 1,37,41,42 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 41 * * column 6, line 1 - line 32 *; | [A]WO0011243 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [A] 1,24-30,35,36 * page 9, line 18 - page 12, line 11 *; | [AD]US6077415 (DURUZ JEAN-JACQUES [CH], et al) [AD] 1,11,12,14,15,20-22,25-30,43-47 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 65 *; | [A]WO0131091 (ALCOA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9,48 * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 32; table 1 * * page 12, line 17 - line 26 *; | [A]WO0142535 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [A] 1,10-48* examples 1-6 *; | [A]US2001020590 (DURUZ JEAN-JACQUES [CH], et al) [A] 1,14,15,20,22,25,28-30 * paragraphs [0056] - [0085] *; | [A]US2003196909 (BERGSMA S CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] *; | [PA]WO2004035871 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [PA] 1-9 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [A] - CHERNOV R V, Electrolytic silicon-aluminium alloy prodn. - from a melt contg. aluminium and silicon oxide(s) and sodium, potassium and aluminium fluoride(s), DERWENT, (19770520), XP002273274 [A] 1-9 * abstract * |