EP1751055 - NANOSTRUCTURES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH NANOSTRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2007/07] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Peter, K. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHEN, Zexiang c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MERIKHI, Jacqueline c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05718738.7 | 15.04.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005IB51242 | Priority number, date | EP20040101616 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04101616 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005102922 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751055 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/02, B32B7/00, G01N27/12 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
C30B11/12 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOSTRUKTUREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/07] | English: | NANOSTRUCTURES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH NANOSTRUCTURES | [2007/07] | French: | NANOSTRUCTURES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001236878 ; | [X]WO0063115 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 11 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001236878 A 20010831 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DAI H, "Carbon nanotubes: opportunities and challenges", SURFACE SCIENCE, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020310), vol. 500, no. 1-3, ISSN 0039-6028, pages 218 - 241, XP004693300 [A] 8-12 * "Nanotube growth"; "Controlled nanotube growth by chemical vapor deposition" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0039-6028(01)01558-8 |