EP1742578 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELECTRON BEAM COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:BE
CY
FR
GR
IE
IT
MC
NL
SI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
CY
FR
GR
IE
IT
MC
NL
SI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2007/03] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
CY
FR
GR
IE
IT
MC
NL
SI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOMBERG, Hermann, Philips Intel. Prop. & Stand. Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05718746.0 | 18.04.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005IB51252 | Priority number, date | EP20040101786 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: EP 04101786 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005104952 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1742578 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
A61B6/4085 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4028 (EP,US);
A61B6/4275 (EP,US);
A61B6/4411 (EP,US);
A61B6/466 (EP,US);
H01J35/30 (EP,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/027 (EP,US);
A61B6/4488 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE ELEKTRONENSTRAHL-COMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIE | [2007/03] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELECTRON BEAM COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY | [2007/03] | French: | TOMOGRAPHIE PAR ORDINATEUR TRIDIMENSIONNELLE PAR FAISCEAU D'ELECTRONS | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6047040 (HU HUI [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 1, lines 40-43 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 40 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US5757878 (DOBBS JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 5, lines 8-63 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO03051201 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0058] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2002094064 (ZHOU OTTO Z [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0065] * * claim 20 * * figure 4 *; | [AD]US2003161434 (RAND ROY E [US], et al) [AD] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0038] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraphs [0072] , [0073] * * figures 1C,1D,6A,6B *; | [A]US2002168053 (SCHOMBERG HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1,3,7,9 * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] * * figures 5,10-19 * | Examination | WO2004096050 | by applicant | US4352021 | US2003161434 | US6047040 | WO03051201 | - M. DEFRISE ET AL., "A cone-beam reconstruction algorithm using shift-variant filtering and cone-beam backprojection", IEEE - TRANS. MED. IMAGE, (199403), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 186 - 195 | - H. SCHOMBERG, "Complete source trajectories for C-arm systems and a method for coping with truncated cone-beam projections", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 INTERNATIONAL MEETING ON FULLY THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION IN RADIOLOGY AND NUCLEAR MEDICINE, PACIFIC GROVE, (20011030), pages 221 - 224 |