EP1835626 - DC OFFSET COMPENSATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Hiroyoshi, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 02 /
FUDABA, Nobukazu, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 03 /
NAGATANI, Kazuo, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 04 /
HAMADA, Hajime, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 05 /
KUBO, Tokuro, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | [2010/33] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Hiroyoshi, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | ||
02 /
FUDABA, Nobukazu, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | |||
03 /
NAGATANI, Kazuo, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | |||
04 /
HAMADA, Hajime, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | |||
05 /
KUBO, Tokuro, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05719049.8 | 04.01.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005JP00002 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072973 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1835626 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1835626 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, H04L27/20, H04L27/36, H03M1/10 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
H04L25/061 (EP,US);
H04L27/364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/15] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROM-OFFSETKOMPENSATIONSVERFAHREN UND -EINRICHTUNG | [2007/38] | English: | DC OFFSET COMPENSATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2007/38] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE DÉCALAGE CC | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2007 | Translation filed | 20.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LARS SUNDSTROM ET AL, "Quantization Analysis and Design of a Digital Predistortion Linearizer for RF Power Amplifiers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19961101), vol. 45, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9545, XP011063529 [X] 1-39 * pages 707-709; figures 1,3,5,6 * | International search | [X]JP2002077285 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC); | [Y]JPH0983587 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH10136048 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS); | [A]JP2001267850 (FUJITSU LTD) | Examination | US6141390 | US2004082305 | by applicant | JP2002077285 | US2004082305 | US6141390 | - LARS SUNDSTRON ET AL., "Quantization Analysis and Design of a Digital Predistortion Linearizer for RF Power Amplifiers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19961101), vol. 45, no. 4 |