EP1719632 - LABEL PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Yasuyuki c/o MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozaki-chi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 02 /
TAHARA, Shosaku c/o MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozaki-chi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 03 /
SANO, Chizuo c/o MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozaki-chi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 04 /
YAMAZAKI, Akimitsu c/o MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozaki-chi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05719384.9 | 22.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005JP02809 | Priority number, date | JP20040048822 | 24.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004048822 | [2006/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005080086 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1719632 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J21/00, B41J29/38, G06F3/12, B41J3/36, H04N1/00, H04N1/40, H04N1/387 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H04N1/3871 (EP,US);
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
H04N1/00132 (EP,US);
H04N1/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | B41J21/00, B41J29/38, G06F3/12, B41J3/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETIKETTENDRUCKER | [2006/45] | English: | LABEL PRINTER | [2006/45] | French: | IMPRIMANTE D'ETIQUETTES | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2006 | Translation filed | 18.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0207428 (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10,13; | [Y]JP2004025680 (SATO KK) [Y] 9,10,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5608542 (KRAHE MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 3,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - line 47 * | International search | [X]JP2004025680 (SATO KK); | [Y]JP2000118090 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003274133 (RICOH KK) |