EP1720046 - LIGHT REFLECTOR AND LIGHTING FIXTURE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kazuki MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS,LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 5718686 / JP | 02 /
NOGUCHI, Shinji MARSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS,LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 5718686 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Satoru MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS,LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 5718686 / JP | [2016/26] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
WATANABE, Kazuki MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 5718686 / JP | ||
02 /
NOGUCHI, Shinji MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 5718686 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAUCHI, Satoru MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 5718686 / JP | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/45] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Marks & Clerk 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05719437.5 | 23.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005JP02929 | Priority number, date | JP20040048660 | 24.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004048660 | [2006/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005081021 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720046 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720046 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, F21V7/22 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G02B5/0808 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (KR);
F21V7/28 (EP,US);
G02B5/0858 (EP);
G02B5/0866 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LICHTREFLEKTOR UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2006/45] | English: | LIGHT REFLECTOR AND LIGHTING FIXTURE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2006/45] | French: | RÉFLECTEUR DE LUMIÈRE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE ENGLOBANT LEDIT RÉFLECTEUR | [2016/25] |
Former [2006/45] | R FLECTEUR DE LUMI RE ET SYST ME D’&Ea cute;CLAIRAGE ENGLOBANT LEDIT R FLECTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2006 | Translation filed | 23.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 08.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2005 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | GB | 23.02.2017 | IE | 23.02.2017 | LU | 23.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | FR | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.02.2005 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.02.2005 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
GB | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002154407 (FRAZIER ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * [Y] 13; | [Y]US4358507 (SENAHA SUSUMU, et al) [Y] 13 * example 9 *; | [DA]JP2000340015 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH10287846 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]WO9938036 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2000212484 (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001060316 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2001081403 (TEIKOKU CHEM IND CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2001208904 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2001270044 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2002006123 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2002348534 (NIPPON ARC CO LTD); | [Y]US2003169506 (FURUYA YOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [Y]US2003180177 (MURATA HIDEO [JP]) | Examination | US2002064664 |