EP1720209 - SEPARATOR FOR LEAD ACID STORAGE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GS Yuasa International Ltd. 1, Inobaba-cho, Nishinosho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states GS Yuasa International Ltd. 1, Inobaba-cho, Nishinosho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | |||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states GS Yuasa International Ltd. 1, Inobaba-cho, Nishinosho Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | |||
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states GS Yuasa Corporation 1, Inobaba-cho, Nishinosho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNAMI, Y., @NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058552 / JP | 02 /
NAGAKUBO, Shuhei, @NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058552 / JP | 03 /
SHIDOMI, Takashi, @NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058552 / JP | 04 /
KITA, Masaki, @c/o GS Yuasa Corporation 1, Inobanba-cho, Nishinosho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018520 / JP | 05 /
YAMASHITA, Junpei, @c/o GS Yuasa Corporation 1, Inobanba-cho, Nishinosho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018520 / JP | [2017/14] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
MATSUNAMI, Y., NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058552 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAKUBO, Shuhei, NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058552 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIDOMI, Takashi, NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 1058552 / JP | |||
04 /
KITA, Masaki, c/o GS Yuasa Corporation 1, Inobanba-cho, Nishinosho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018520 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMASHITA, Junpei, c/o GS Yuasa Corporation 1, Inobanba-cho, Nishinosho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6018520 / JP | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05719491.2 | 24.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005JP03041 | Priority number, date | JP20040055476 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004055476 | [2006/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005083816 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720209 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720209 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H01M50/446 (EP,US);
H01M10/06 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2017/14] |
Former [2007/23] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRENNGLIED FÜR EINEN BLEIAKKUMULATOR | [2006/45] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR LEAD ACID STORAGE BATTERY | [2006/45] | French: | SEPARATEUR POUR ACCUMULATEUR AU PLOMB | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2006 | Translation filed | 24.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9420995 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, lines 1-10 * * page 24, lines 30-36 *; | [A]EP0507090 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5462820 (TANAKA MITSUTOSHI [JP]) [A] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2003297679 (NIPPON MUKI KK); | [A]JP2003109567 (NIPPON MUKI KK); | [A]JPS59211959 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JP2001283820 (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO LTD); | [A]JPH04296447 (NIPPON MUKI KK) |