EP1731329 - IMAGE FORMING METHOD AND RECORDING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Norikazu, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 02 /
MIZUKAMI, Fumihiko, DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 03 /
AOYAGI, Makoto, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 04 /
MATSUYAMA, Tetsuya, DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 05 /
FUNADA, Hiroshi, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 06 /
ISHIDA, Tadahiro, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05720227.7 | 08.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP03955 | Priority number, date | JP20040063487 | 08.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004063487 | JP20040104586 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004104586 | JP20040106969 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004106969 | [2006/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084960 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731329 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10, G02B5/18, G06K19/10, G03H1/04 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
G03H1/0011 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/328 (KR);
G02B5/18 (KR);
G03H1/0256 (EP,KR,US);
G03H1/041 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/16 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | B42D15/10, G02B5/18, G06K19/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL | [2006/50] | English: | IMAGE FORMING METHOD AND RECORDING MATERIAL | [2006/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'IMAGE ET MATERIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | Translation filed | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.03.2015 | 18.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/40] | 22.05.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH02212195 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 11-13; | [Y]JPH05330251 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 11-13* the whole document *; | [X]JPH06247084 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH11353518 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 5-10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH06247084 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JPH11353518 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [X]JPH02212195 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05330251 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2001030666 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) |