EP1857505 - UNSATURATED POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION FOR LAMP REFLECTORS AND MOLDINGS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2010/48] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER CO., LTD. 20, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANE, Kunio Showa Highpolymer Co., Ltd. Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 679-4155 / JP | 02 /
KANEOKA, Hidekazu, Showa Highpolymer Co., Ltd. 251-1, Ibonaka, Ibo-cho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4155 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
YAMANE, Kunio Showa Highpolymer Co., Ltd. Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 679-4155 / JP | ||
02 /
KANEOKA, Hidekazu, Showa Highpolymer Co., Ltd. 251-1, Ibonaka, Ibo-cho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4155 / JP | |||
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
YAMANE, Kunio, 2Showa Highpolymer Co., Ltd. 251-, Ibonaka, Ibo-cho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4155 / JP | ||
02 /
KANEOKA, Hidekazu, Showa Highpolymer Co., Ltd. 251-1, Ibonaka, Ibo-cho Tatsuno-shi, Hyogo 679-4155 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720268.1 | 08.03.2005 | [2007/47] | WO2005JP03996 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006095414 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1857505 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857505 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/06, C08G63/547, C08F283/01, F21V7/22, C09D167/06 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
C08F283/01 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/24 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/47] | C08L67/06, C08G63/547, C08F283/01, F21V7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2016/33] |
Former [2008/24] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UNGESÄTTIGTES POLYESTERHARZ ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR LAMPENREFLEKTOREN UND FORMKÖRPER DARAUS | [2007/47] | English: | UNSATURATED POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION FOR LAMP REFLECTORS AND MOLDINGS THEREOF | [2007/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYESTER INSATURÉ POUR DES RÉFLECTEURS DE LAMPES ET ARTICLES MOULÉS FORMÉS À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2007 | Translation filed | 22.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11269236 ; | [Y]JPH11314312 ; | [Y]EP0028841 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3 * claims 1-3,9 * * pages 1,4,6,9 * * pages 10,11,12 * * page 16 * * examples 2, 7; tables II, VII *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 53, Database accession no. 1999-615596, XP002733907 & JPH11269236 A 19991005 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 05, Database accession no. 2000-057699, XP002733908 & JPH11314312 A 19991116 (SHOWA HIGH POLYMER CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH05247333 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER); | [A]JPH03285946 (SHOWA HIGHPOLYMER) |