EP1726841 - HYDRAULIC CLUTCH RELEASING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATTORI, Yasuaki, AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Toshiyuki, AISIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 1-15, Hachikencho, Kariya Aichi 448-8605 / JP | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720320.0 | 09.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005JP04048 | Priority number, date | JP20040079520 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004079520 | JP20040276652 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004276652 | [2006/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090812 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726841 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/08, F16D25/12 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
F16D25/087 (EP);
F16D25/083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/26] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE KUPPLUNGSFREIGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2006/48] | English: | HYDRAULIC CLUTCH RELEASING DEVICE | [2006/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEBRAYAGE HYDRAULIQUE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | Translation filed | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]GB2287295 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *[X] 11-14; | [AX]DE19636399 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-7 * [X] 11-14; | [AX]DE19835707 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * [X] 11-14; | [PAX]DE102004032038 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [PA] 1-10 * figures 1-10 * [PX] 11-14; | [E]DE102005030732 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [E] 1-3,5-14 * figures 1a-1c * | International search | [Y]DE4427942 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]); | [Y]JPH1047381 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG); | [A]WO9737148 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD FRANCE [FR], et al); | [A]JPH11132254 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP, et al) |