EP1734006 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TANTALUM OXIDE AND/OR NIOBIUM OXIDE IN FORM OF HOLLOW PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stella Chemifa Corporation NM Plaza Midosuji, 3-6-3, Awajimachi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0047 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Stella Chemifa Corporation NM Plaza Midosuji, 6-3, Awajimachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0047 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUYAMA, Hirohisa, c/o STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka, 5950075 / JP | 02 /
WAKI, Masahide, c/o STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka, 5950075 / JP | 03 /
HASHIGUCHI, Shinji, c/o STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka, 5950075 / JP | 04 /
AOKI, Kenji, c/o STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 41, R inkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka, 5950075 / JP | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720638.5 | 11.03.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005JP04367 | Priority number, date | JP20040068313 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004068313 | [2006/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005087668 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734006 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01G35/00, C01G33/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C01G33/00 (EP,US);
C01G35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TANTALOXID UND/ODER NIOBOXID IN HOHLTEILCHENFORM | [2006/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING TANTALUM OXIDE AND/OR NIOBIUM OXIDE IN FORM OF HOLLOW PARTICLE | [2006/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE DE L'OXYDE DE TANTALE ET/OU DE L'OXYDE DE NIOBIUM SOUS FORME DE PARTICULE CREUSE | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2006 | Translation filed | 10.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 27.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5983937 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]JP2001329321 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO); | [A]JP2004051383 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) |