17.05.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
08.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.06.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.03.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
20.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
23.12.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
23.12.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
23.12.2011 |
Change - French title |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
29.04.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
29.04.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
15.04.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
25.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.01.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.09.2010 |
First examination report |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
09.04.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
25.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
27.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2007 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
18.05.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
10.11.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
08.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|