Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7828107 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2010 | B2 | US2007289803 | 20.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004069168 | 11.03.2004 | WO2005JP04394 | 08.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101078539B | Global Dossier | 01.11.2011 | B1 | KR20070001998 | 04.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004069168 | 11.03.2004 | WO2005JP04394 | 08.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1731801 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | B1 | EP1731801 | 12.05.2010 | A4 | EP1731801 | 13.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004069168 | 11.03.2004 | WO2005JP04394 | 08.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005088169 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004069168 | 11.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4373820B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B2 | JP2005256408 | 22.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004069168 | 11.03.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100562676C | 25.11.2009 | C | CN1930409 | 14.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004069168 | 11.03.2004 |