EP1731801 - FORWARD/BACKWARD MOVEMENT OPERATION DEVICE FOR WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | [2012/28] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states TCM Corporation 15-10, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Masaki., c/o Hitachi Contruction Mach. Tsuchiura Works; 650, Kadatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi / JP | 02 /
MUROTA, Jujitsu c/o Hitachi Contruction Mach. Tsuchiura Works; 650, Kadatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi / JP | 03 /
YAMAZAKI, Yasuo, c/o Tech. Adm. Group, TCM Corp. 15-10, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Tishi-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2006/50] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05720665.8 | 08.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP04394 | Priority number, date | JP20040069168 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004069168 | [2006/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088169 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731801 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1731801 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, F16H59/12 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
F16H59/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/00 (KR);
B60K20/02 (KR);
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/2004 (EP,US);
E02F9/22 (KR);
E02F9/24 (EP,US);
F16H59/12 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0256 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | F16H61/00, B60K20/02, E02F9/24, F16H59/02 | ||
Former IPC [2006/50] | F16H61/00, B60K20/02, E02F9/24, // F16H59/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2007/25] |
Former [2006/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORWÄRTS-/RÜCKWÄRTSBEWEGUNGSBETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2006/50] | English: | FORWARD/BACKWARD MOVEMENT OPERATION DEVICE FOR WORK MACHINE | [2006/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOUVEMENT AVANT / ARRIÈRE POUR VÉHICULE DE CHANTIER | [2012/07] |
Former [2006/50] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOUVEMENT AVANT/ARRI RE POUR MAC HINE D'USINAGE | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | Translation filed | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | [2013/15] |
Former [2013/12] | SE | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS62185930 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]US4700802 (FOUGHT GERALD E [US]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH051436 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [YD]JPH11268656 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [YD] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1122368 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 1-4* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH11268656 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]US4700802 (FOUGHT GERALD E [US]); | [Y]JPS63107135U ; | [Y]JPH0462027U ; | [Y]JP2002323931 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPH068462U ; | [A]JPH1082073 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH); | [A]US4119000 (VENABLE PHILLIP G) | by applicant | US4700802 |