EP1726779 - ROTARY TYPE EXPANSION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Bldg., 2-4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMOTO, Masakazu, c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 5918511 / JP | 02 /
MORIWAKI, Michio, c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 5918511 / JP | 03 /
KUMAKURA, Eiji, c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 5918511 / JP | 04 /
OKAMOTO, Tetsuya, c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 5918511 / JP | 05 /
SAKITANI, Katsumi, c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1304, Kanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 5918511 / JP | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720759.9 | 15.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005JP04502 | Priority number, date | JP20040074454 | 16.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004074454 | [2006/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088079 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726779 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/356, F01C11/00, F01C13/04, F01C19/08, F01C21/04, F04C18/356, F04C27/00, F16J15/18, F16J15/447 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
F16J15/324 (EP,US);
F01C1/356 (KR);
F01C11/00 (KR);
F01C19/08 (EP,US);
F04C18/356 (KR);
F16J15/18 (KR);
F01C1/3564 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTATIONSEXPANSIONSMASCHINE | [2006/48] | English: | ROTARY TYPE EXPANSION MACHINE | [2006/48] | French: | MACHINE D’EXPANSION DU TYPE ROTATIF | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2006 | Translation filed | 14.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4243233 (ARAI YOSHIO) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 54 - line 59; figure 3 * * column 4, line 33 - line 36 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US4212473 (ARAI YOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [I] 7,8; | [XY]JPH09144680 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * [Y] 3; | [XI]JPH0335287U (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1,4,5,7 * page 10, line 17; figures 1,5 * [I] 8; | [XI]JPS5496406U (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO. LTD) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 1,2 * [I] 7,8; | [Y]JPH04143483 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS5459406U ; | [Y]JPS5887987U ; | [Y]JP2004044569 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JPH0335287U ; | [Y]JPH09144680 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS5464209 (TOYO KOGYO CO); | [Y]JPS62113882 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS, et al); | [A]JP2003172244 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH04143483 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH07133776 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |