EP1731612 - RECOMBINANT HERPESVIRUS AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEVA Santé Animale SA 10, avenue de la Ballastière 33501 Libourne Cedex / FR | [2011/20] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states CEVA Santé Animale SA Z.I. La Ballastiere BP 26 33501 Libourne / FR | ||
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states ZEON CORPORATION 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuda, Takashi c/o Zeon Corporation, 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 02 /
Saitoh, Shuji c/o Zeon Corporation, 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 03 /
Saeki, Sakiko c/o Zeon Corporation, 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25 Rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Becker, Philippe, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/37] | Lecca, Patricia S., et al Cabinet Lecca 21 rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/37] | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21 rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/11] | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21, rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720839.9 | 09.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005JP04585 | Priority number, date | JP20040095500 | 29.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004095500 | [2006/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005093070 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731612 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1731612 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/38, C12N15/869, A61K39/255, A61K39/265, C12N7/01 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/245 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16022 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16034 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16043 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16334 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | C12N15/38, C12N15/869, A61K39/255, A61K39/265, C12N7/01, // C12N7/01, C12R1/93 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES HERPESVIRUS UND DESSEN NUTZUNG | [2006/50] | English: | RECOMBINANT HERPESVIRUS AND UTILIZATION OF THE SAME | [2006/50] | French: | VIRUS DE L' HERPES RECOMBINANT ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2006 | Translation filed | 29.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 07.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2005 | AT | 17.08.2011 | BE | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | IT | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | IE | 09.03.2012 | LU | 09.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
LU | 09.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6001369 (COCHRAN MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1-7* examples 3C,4A,4B,4C; claim 5 * | International search | [X]US5443831 (KEELER CALVIN L [US], et al); | [Y]JPH11192093 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [X]JP2001000188 (NIPPON ZEON CO) |