EP1727293 - CELL SEARCH METHOD FOR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZALIO, Filip 4/4 Florence Street, Glen Waverley, Victoria 3150 / AU | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Betten, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Betten & Resch, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05720868.8 | 16.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005JP04614 | Priority number, date | AU20040901383 | 16.03.2004 Original published format: AU 2004901383 | AU20050200628 | 11.02.2005 Original published format: AU 2005200628 | [2006/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005088855 | Date: | 22.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1727293 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727293 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04W76/02 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H04B1/70735 (EP,US);
H04B1/7083 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/48] | H04B1/707, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/25] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLENSUCHVERFAHREN FÜR EIN FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2006/48] | English: | CELL SEARCH METHOD FOR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2006/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECHERCHE DE CELLULE POUR SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION PAR RADIO | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2006 | Translation filed | 11.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003273776 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2004064266 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-9* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2001119321 (NIPPON ELECTRIC IC MICROCOMPUT); | [A]JP2002141886 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2002185365 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2004266312 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |