EP1739768 - LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY AND CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROLLING SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Kiyomi c/0Matsushita Electric Industrial Co 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka -shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Kaoru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co 3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Price, Paul Anthony King D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05720908.2 | 16.03.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005JP04654 | Priority number, date | JP20040098986 | 30.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004098986 | JP20040292226 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004292226 | [2007/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005098996 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739768 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M4/02, H01M10/40 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0585 (KR);
H01M10/42 (KR);
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (KR);
H01M50/431 (KR);
H01M50/449 (EP,US);
H01M50/46 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M50/59 (KR);
H02J7/04 (KR);
H01M2010/4292 (KR);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMIONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND LADE-/ ENTLADESTEUERSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2007/01] | English: | LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY AND CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROLLING SYSTEM THEREOF | [2007/01] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ION LITHIUM ET SON SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE/DECHARGE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2006 | Translation filed | 11.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 27.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5147739 (BEARD KIRBY W [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 4, lines 18-52; table 1 *; | [Y]EP0517070 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0715366 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 40; example 1 * [Y] 4-7 | International search | [A]JPH07220759 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH0850922 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH08255610 (CANON KK); | [X]JPH09190814 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH1012279 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JPH11102730 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2001351686 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al); | [Y]JP2002093405 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JP2003208891 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2003331824 (NEC CORP) |