EP1719122 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OVERWRITING DATA IN WRITE-ONCE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Yong Cheol 402-803 Jung Apt. Byeoryang-dong Gwachon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-731 / KR | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
PARK, Yong Cheol 407-306 Jugong APT. Byeoryang-dong Gwachon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-731 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05721870.3 | 22.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005KR00480 | Priority number, date | US20040547186P | 25.02.2004 Original published format: US 547186 P | KR20040025320 | 13.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004025320 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005079175 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1719122 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1719122 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B20/18 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
H04M1/72454 (KR);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04M1/22 (KR);
G11B2020/10907 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1288 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1873 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2541 (EP,US);
H04M2201/34 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERSCHREIBEN VON DATEN IN EINEM EINMALBESCHREIBBAREN AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OVERWRITING DATA IN WRITE-ONCE RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REECRITURE DE DONNEES SUR UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT NON REINSCRIPTIBLE | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2005 | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
PT | 16.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5210734 (SAKURAI YUKIMITSU [JP]); | [A]US2003135800 (KIM BYUNG-JIN [KR], et al); | [A]WO2004015707 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) |