EP1711264 - INTEGRATED SYSTEM WITH MODULAR MICROFLUIDIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/42] | INTEGRATED SYSTEM WITH MODULAR MICROFLUIDI COMPONENTS | ||
[2009/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Valley Scientific, Inc. 5720 Stoneridge Drive, Bldg. B., Suite 300 Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [2010/04] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Silicon Valley Scientific, Inc. 4059 Clipper Court Fremont CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOVANOVICH, Stevan, B. 723 Hazel Street Livermore, CA 94550 / US | 02 /
BLAGA, Luliu 40771 Robin Street Fremont, CA 94402 / US | 03 /
MCINTOSH, Roger 4056 Greenwich Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/42] | 01 /
JOVANOVICH, Stevan, B. 723 Hazel Street Livermore, CA 94550 / US | ||
02 /
BLAGA, Luliu 40771 Robin Street Fremont, CA 94402 / US | |||
03 /
MCINTOSH, Roger 602 Bean Creek Road Scotts Valley, CA 95067 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05722738.1 | 02.02.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005US03579 | Priority number, date | US20040541473P | 02.02.2004 Original published format: US 541473 P | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075081 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711264 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711264 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L9/00, G01N27/447 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/502738 (EP);
B01L3/502715 (EP);
B01L9/527 (EP);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2200/027 (EP);
B01L2300/087 (EP);
B01L2400/0644 (EP);
B01L2400/065 (EP);
G01N2021/0346 (EP);
G01N21/645 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES SYSTEM MIT MODULAREN MIKROFLUIDISCHEN KOMPONENTEN | [2006/42] | English: | INTEGRATED SYSTEM WITH MODULAR MICROFLUIDIC COMPONENTS | [2009/40] | French: | SYSTEME INTEGRE EQUIPE DE COMPOSANTS MICROFLUIDIQUES MODULAIRES | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/42] | INTEGRATED SYSTEM WITH MODULAR MICROFLUIDI COMPONENTS | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | HU | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5580523 (BARD ALLEN J [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19917330 (INST MIKROTECHNIK MAINZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1174182 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2004012862 (AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES SV CORP [US]) [PX] 1-5,15,29,30 * the whole document *; | [X] - DARLING R B, "DEVELOPMENT OF A HIGH DENSITY, PLANAR, MODULAR MICROFLUIDIC INTERCONNECT SYSTEM", TRANSDUCERS '01 EUROSENSORS XV. 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. MUNICH, JUNE 10 - 14, 2001, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, BER, (20010610), VOL. 2, ISBN 3-540-42150-5, pages 974 - 977, XP001154016 [X] 1-5,15,29,30 * the whole document * | [A] - GRODZINSKI, YANG, LIU, WARD, "BioMEMS and BioMedical Nanotechnology: A Modular Microfluidic System for Cell Pre-concentration and Genetic Sample Preparation", BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, (2003), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 303 - 310, XP002329829 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1027357713526 | [A] - MAN P F ET AL, "MICROFLUIDIC PLASTIC INTERCONNECTS FOR MULTI-BIOANALYSIS CHIP MODULES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19870929), vol. 3224, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 196 - 200, XP001030097 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.284516 | [A] - BHANSALI SHEKHAR ET AL, "A modular approach for development of miniature detection systems", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. E2003217474476, XP001205794 [A] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.489851 | [ ] - PROC SPIE INT SOC OPT ENG; PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING 2002, (2002), vol. 4936, pages 119 - 125 |