EP1733069 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A METAL LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED TBS Broadcast Center 3-6, Akasaka 5-chome Minota-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED TBS Broadcast Center 3-6, Akasaka 5-chome Minota-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Taro, c/o Tokyo Electron AT Ltd 650 Mitsuzawa, Hosaka-cho Nirasaki-City, Yamanashi 407-0192 / JP | 02 /
MATSUDA, Tsukasa c/o Tokjo El.U.S.Hold., Inc,4350 W.Chandler Blvd. Suit 10/11, Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | 03 /
MCFEELY, Fenton, R. 25 Donald Lane Ossining, NY 10562 / US | 04 /
MALHOTRA, Sandra, G. c/o Tokyo El.U.S.Hold., Inc, 4350 W.Chandler Blvd. Suit 10/11, Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | 05 /
SIMON, Andrew, H. 269 Crestwood Court Fishkill, NY 12524 / US | 06 /
YURKAS, John, J. 94 Haig Avenue Stamford, CT 06905 / US | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
IKEDA, Taro, c/o Tokyo Electron AT Ltd 650 Mitsuzawa, Hosaka-cho Nirasaki-City, Yamanashi 407-0192 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUDA, Tsukasa 1770-43 Ryuchi, Futaba-cho Kitakoma-gun, Yamanashi 407-0104 / JP | |||
03 /
MCFEELY, Fenton, R. 25 Donald Lane Ossining, NY 10562 / US | |||
04 /
MALHOTRA, Sandra, G. 97 Rombout Avenue Beacon, NY 12508 / US | |||
05 /
SIMON, Andrew, H. 269 Crestwood Court Fishkill, NY 12524 / US | |||
06 /
YURKAS, John, J. 94 Haig Avenue Stamford, CT 06905 / US | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Andréasson, Ivar, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05722763.9 | 08.02.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005US03669 | Priority number, date | US20040813680 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 813680 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103323 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733069 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/02, C23C16/16 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C23C16/5096 (EP,US);
C23C16/02 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDUNG EINER METALLSCHICHT | [2006/51] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A METAL LAYER | [2006/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'UNE COUCHE METALLIQUE | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 30.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5236747 (DESSAUX ODILE [FR], et al) [X] 1-42 * column 2, line 41 - column 6, line 63 *; | [A]FR2616088 (RIFA SA [FR]) [A] 1-42 * claim - *; | [A]US5990013 (BERENGUER MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document * |