EP1714190 - WATERMARKING METHOD FOR MOTION PICTURE IMAGE SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Paul William 644 Reed Road Churchville, New York 14428 / US | 02 /
HEATH, John Allen 7671 Pine Tree Drive Victor, New York 14564 / US | 03 /
ZOLLA, Robert Joseph 273 Avalon Drive Rochester, New York 14618 / US | 04 /
MACKENZIE, Scott Pearson 83 Sweden Hill Road Brockport, New York 14420 / US | 05 /
POWERS, Thomas Foster 1239 Stockbridge Road Webster, New York 14580 / US | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Lee, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/43] | Lee, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05722910.6 | 10.02.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005US04215 | Priority number, date | US20040778528 | 13.02.2004 Original published format: US 778528 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005081058 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714190 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/08, G03C11/02, H04N1/32, G06T1/00 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
G03C11/02 (EP,US);
G06T1/0071 (EP,US);
G06T1/0085 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0051 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [2007/21] |
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERZEICHENVERFAHREN FÜR EINE SPIELFILM-BILDSEQUENZ | [2006/43] | English: | WATERMARKING METHOD FOR MOTION PICTURE IMAGE SEQUENCE | [2006/43] | French: | METHODE DE FILIGRANE POUR UNE SEQUENCE D'IMAGES EN DEPLACEMENT | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US6044156 (HONSINGER CHRIS W [US], et al) [DX] 1-65* figure 5; claim - *; | [DPX]US2004156111 (RODDY JAMES E [US], et al) [DPX] 1-65 * figure 2; claim - * |