EP1720868 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS VANILLOID RECEPTOR LIGANDS AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. M/S 27-4-A One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hui-Ling 822 Lynnmere Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91360 / US | 02 /
BALAN, Chenera 4586 Via Rodeo Thousand Oaks, California 91320 / US | 03 /
DOHERTY, Elizabeth, M. 1542 Campbell Avenue Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 04 /
FALSEY, James, Richard 4943 Hollyglen Court Moorpark, California 93021 / US | 05 /
GORE, Vijay, Keshav 4302 Via Encanto Thousand Oaks, California 91320 / US | 06 /
KATON, Jodie 6330 Rand Avenue No.E115 Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | 07 /
NORMAN, Mark, H. 130 Venus Street Thousand Oaks, California 91360 / US | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05722962.7 | 11.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005US04378 | Priority number, date | US20040543896P | 11.02.2004 Original published format: US 543896 P | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077944 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1720868 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720868 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D413/12, C07D471/04, A61K31/506, A61P29/00 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | 24.08.2006 | BA | 24.08.2006 | HR | 24.08.2006 | LV | 24.08.2006 | MK | 24.08.2006 | YU | 24.08.2006 | Title | German: | PYRIMIDINDERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS VANILLOIDREZEPTORLIGANDEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN | [2006/46] | English: | PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS VANILLOID RECEPTOR LIGANDS AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF PAIN | [2006/46] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRIMIDINE UTILISES COMME LIGANDS DE RECEPTEUR DE VANILLOIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.2009 | BE | 04.11.2009 | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | GB | 11.02.2010 | IE | 11.02.2010 | IT | 11.02.2010 | LU | 11.02.2010 | ES | 12.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2010 | ||
IT | 11.02.2010 | ||
LU | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 12.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2010 | ||
IT | 11.02.2010 | ||
LU | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 12.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2010 | ||
IT | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 12.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2010 | ||
IT | 11.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 04.11.2009 | |
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 04.11.2009 | |
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03099284 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* claims 1,6 *; | [PX]WO2004014871 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * examples 221,222; claims 1,5 * |