EP1725253 - MEDICAMENTS AND METHODS FOR TREATING HEADACHE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURKEL, Catherine, C. 19 Suprema Drive Newport Coat, CA 92627 / US | 02 /
BRIN, Mitchell, F. 30 San Antonio Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05723092.2 | 15.02.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005US04778 | Priority number, date | US20040789180 | 26.02.2004 Original published format: US 789180 | US20050039506 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 39506 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005082339 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1725253 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725253 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/48 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A61K38/4893 (EP,US);
A61K39/08 (KR);
A61K38/48 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOPFSCHMERZEN | [2006/48] | English: | MEDICAMENTS AND METHODS FOR TREATING HEADACHE | [2006/48] | French: | MEDICAMENTS ET METHODES POUR TRAITER UNE CEPHALEE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11194257.9 / EP2433643 | EP14163033.5 / EP2752197 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - LODER ELIZABETH ET AL, "Use of botulinum toxins for chronic headaches: a focused review.", THE CLINICAL JOURNAL OF PAIN. 2002 NOV-DEC, (200211), vol. 18, no. 6 Suppl, ISSN 0749-8047, pages S169 - S176, XP009048989 [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * page S170, column R, lines 1-5,31-35 * * figure 1 * * page S172, column R, lines 6-29 * * page S174, column R, line 46 - page S175, column L, line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002508-200211001-00009 | [X] - TEPPER STEWART ET AL, "Botulinum Toxin type A in the preventive treatment of refractory headaches: Comparison between medication overusers and nonmedication overusers groups.", CEPHALALGIA, & 11TH CONGRESS OF THE INTERNATIONAL HEADACHE SOCIETY (IHC); ROME, ITALY; SEPTEMBER 13-16, 2003, (200309), vol. 23, no. 7, ISSN 0333-1024, page 715, XP009048998 [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * | [X] - GLADSTONE J ET AL, "Chronic Daily Headache: A Rational-Approach to a Challenging Problem", SEMINARS IN NEUROLOGY 2003 UNITED STATES, (2003), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0271-8235, pages 265 - 275, XP009048968 [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * pages 268-271: Case 2 and comments thereto * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2003-814738 | [PA] - MAIZELS MORRIS, "The patient with daily headaches.", AMERICAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN. 15 DEC 2004, (20041215), vol. 70, no. 12, ISSN 0002-838X, pages 2299 - 2306, XP002331861 [PA] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * tables 1,4-6 * * page 2302-2303 Section "Drug Rebound and Medication Overuse" * | [PX] - DOWSON A J ET AL, "Managing chronic headaches in the clinic.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PRACTICE. DEC 2004, (200412), vol. 58, no. 12, ISSN 1368-5031, pages 1142 - 1151, XP002331862 [PX] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * table 1 * * page 1144, column L, lines 16-33 * * page 1146, column R, lines 13-15 * * page 1147, column L, lines 7-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-1241.2004.00341.x | [X] - SCHIM JACK, "Effect of preventive treatment with botulinum toxin type A on acute headache medication usage in migraine patients.", CURRENT MEDICAL RESEARCH AND OPINION. JAN 2004, (200401), vol. 20, no. 1, ISSN 0300-7995, pages 49 - 53, XP002340340 [X] 3-8 * Studies 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1185/030079903125002676 | Examination | - DIENER H C ET AL, "OnabotulinumtoxinA for treatment of chronic migraine: results from the double-blind, randomized, placebo-controlled phase of the PREEMPT 2 trial", CEPHALALGIA, SCANDINAVIAN PRESS, NO, (20100701), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0333-1024, pages 804 - 814, XP009149742 |