EP1716290 - FIBROUS STRUCTURES WITH IMPROVED SOFTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRODOEHL, Michael Scott 7978 Kingfisher Lane West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
VINSON, Kenneth Douglas 303 Wyoming Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 05723238.1 | 17.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005US05115 | Priority number, date | US20040782029 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: US 782029 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005080683 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1716290 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
D21H27/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24603 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24992 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERGEBILDE MIT VERBESSERTEM WEICHGRIFF | [2006/44] | English: | FIBROUS STRUCTURES WITH IMPROVED SOFTNESS | [2006/44] | French: | STRUCTURES FIBREUSES D'UNE DOUCEUR AMELIOREE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/06] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1096069 (FORT JAMES CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,8,10 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figures 5-8; claims 1,5; tables 1-13 *; | [XY]US5620776 (SCHULZ GALYN A [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 14 - column 11, line 49; figures 1-20; claims 1,14; table 9 * [Y] 1,10; | [XY]EP0835957 (FORT JAMES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,10 * page 2, line 5 - page 12, line 30; figure 6; examples 1-7 * [Y] 1-3,6,8,10; | [Y]US5458950 (BREDENDICK KENNETH E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,8,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5714041 (AYERS PETER GRAVES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002134520 (BEHNKE JANICA S [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,8,10 * the whole document *; | [YA]US5685954 (MARINACK ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,8,10 * column 15, line 18 - column 22, line 15; figures 33,37,40,43,47,52; examples 1,7,10-13,17,19,24,26; claims 1,4,8,10,13,15,16,20 * [A] 7 |