EP1720505 - COMPRESSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLIS, Heather 49 Walpole Street Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 02 /
WATSON, Kristin 48 Mount Hope Terrace North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05723526.9 | 23.02.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005US05679 | Priority number, date | US20040784604 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784604 | US20040784607 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784607 | US20040784639 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784639 | US20040784323 | 23.02.2004 Original published format: US 784323 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005082316 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1720505 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1720505 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61H23/04 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A61H9/0078 (EP);
A61H23/04 (KR);
A61H2201/1645 (EP);
A61H2201/1697 (EP);
A61H2201/5002 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
A61H2201/5071 (EP);
A61H2205/06 (EP);
A61H2205/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Title | German: | KOMPRESSIONSGERÄT | [2006/46] | English: | COMPRESSION APPARATUS | [2006/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMPRESSION | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2005 | AT | 14.12.2011 | BE | 14.12.2011 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | IE | 23.02.2012 | LU | 23.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2012 | ||
LU | 23.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4696289 (GARDNER ARTHUR M N [GB], et al) [AD] 1-21* the whole document *; | [X]US5354260 (COOK GORDON J [GB]) [X] 1-21 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 30; figure - *; | [A]EP0861651 (KINETIC CONCEPTS INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 6, lines 38-49; figures 1-8,21-23 *; | [AD]US5989204 (LINA CESAR Z [US]) [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]US5997495 (COOK GORDON JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, lines 14-22; figure - *; | [X]US6592534 (RUTT CHRISTIAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, lines 16-19 * * column 4, lines 27-40 * * column 5, lines 30-38; figure - * |