EP1718289 - THERAPEUTIC METHODS EMPLOYING NITRIC OXIDE PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY Office of Technology Transfer Suite 105 1207 17th Avenue South Nashville, TN 37212 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 105, 1207 17th Avenue South Nashville, TN 37212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMMAR, Marshall, L. 513 Bel Air Place Brentwood, TN 37207 / US | 02 /
CHRISTMAN, Brian 1713 Temple Avenue Nashville, TN 37215 / US | 03 /
BARR, Frederick, E. 2507 Natchez Trace Nashville, TN 37212 / US | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Behnisch, Werner, et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR, Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05723789.3 | 24.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US06081 | Priority number, date | US20040785374 | 24.02.2004 Original published format: US 785374 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005082042 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718289 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | A61K31/195, C07H21/04, C12Q1/68, C12N9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | 24.08.2006 | BA | 24.08.2006 | HR | 24.08.2006 | LV | 24.08.2006 | MK | 24.08.2006 | YU | 24.08.2006 | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON STICKOXID-VORLÄUFERN | [2006/45] | English: | THERAPEUTIC METHODS EMPLOYING NITRIC OXIDE PRECURSORS | [2006/45] | French: | METHODES THERAPEUTIQUES FAISANT APPEL A DES PRECURSEURS D'OXYDE NITRIQUE | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/02] | 04.12.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2017 | 08.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP10184493.4 / EP2319507 | EP18158829.4 / EP3351241 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU3460571 (RICHARDSON MERRELL SPA) [X] 1-28 * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [X]WO9416740 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 5, line 10 - line 20 *; | [X]WO0006151 (KUHRTS ERIC [US]) [X] 1-28 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 16, paragraph L - page 17, paragraph 1 *; | [X]WO0073322 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 6, line 14 - line 18 * * page 46, line 10 - line 25 *; | [X]US2001056068 (CHWALISZ KRISTOF [DE], et al) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0052] *; | [X] - BARR F E ET AL, "Effect of cardiopulmonary bypass on urea cycle intermediates and nitric oxide levels after congenital heart surgery", THE JOURNAL OF PEDIADRICS, (2003), vol. 142, no. 1, pages 26 - 30, XP002422409 [X] 1-28 * abstract * * page 29, column R * | [X] - SUSCHEK C V ET AL, "Critical role of L-arginine in endothelial cell survival during oxidative stress", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030527), Database accession no. EMB-2003218186, XP002422418 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - DAGENAIS CAROLINE ET AL, "Acute L-arginine supplement and cardiac surgery", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), Database accession no. PREV199699075415, XP002422419 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - HOJO F ET AL, "Inhibition of spontaneous pulmonary metastases by L-arginine associated with induction of cytotoxic macrophages", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1990), Database accession no. EMB-1990075119, XP002422420 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - GARDINER K R ET AL, "Reduced intestinal absorption of arginine during sepsis.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199507), Database accession no. NLM7600831, XP002422421 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - PERNOW JOHN ET AL, "L-Arginine protects from ischemia-reperfusion-induced endothelial dysfunction in humans in vivo.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200312), Database accession no. PREV200400055833, XP002422422 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - AKISU METE ET AL, "Protective effect of dietary supplementation with L-arginine and L-carnitine on hypoxia/reoxygenation-induced necrotizing enterocolitis in young mice", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200205), Database accession no. PREV200200378590, XP002422423 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - SAIJYO TETSUYA ET AL, "Autonomic nervous system activity during infusion of L-arginine in patients with liver cirrhosis", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199802), Database accession no. PREV199800177848, XP002422424 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [X] - MITANI YOSHIHIDE ET AL, "Prolonged administration of L-arginine ameliorates chronic pulmonary hypertension and pulmonary vascular remodeling in rats", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1997), Database accession no. PREV199799686392, XP002422425 [X] 1-28 * abstract * | [ ] - CIRCULATION 27 MAY 2003 UNITED STATES, (20030527), vol. 107, no. 20, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2607 - 2614 | [ ] - CANADIAN JOURNAL OF ANAESTHESIA, ANNUAL MEETING OF THE CANADIAN ANAESTHETISTS' SOCIETY; MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA; JUNE 14-18, 1996, (1996), vol. 43, no. 5 PART 2, ISSN 0832-610X, page A16 | [ ] - CANCER JOURNAL 1990 FRANCE, (1990), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 0765-7846, pages 14 - 19 | [ ] - CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE JUL 1995, (199507), vol. 23, no. 7, ISSN 0090-3493, pages 1227 - 1232 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, (200312), vol. 95, no. 6, ISSN 8750-7587, pages 2218 - 2222 | [ ] - BIOLOGY OF THE NEONATE, (200205), vol. 81, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3126, pages 260 - 265 | [ ] - LIVER, (199802), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0106-9543, pages 27 - 31 | [ ] - CIRCULATION, (1997), vol. 96, no. 2, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 689 - 697 | International search | [X] - AMIN H.J. ET AL, "Arginine supplementation prevents necrotizing enterocolitis in the premature infant", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, (200204), vol. 140, no. 4, pages 425 - 431, XP002993971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mpd.2002.123289 | [X] - MIZUTANI N. ET AL, "Oral administration of arginine and citrulline in the treatment of lysinuric protein intolerance", TOHOKU JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1984), vol. 142, pages 15 - 24, XP008059480 | [Y] - DAVIES S.M. ET AL, "Idiopathic hyperammonemia: a frequently lethal complication of bone marrow transplantation", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, (199606), vol. 17, pages 1119 - 1125, XP008059479 | [Y] - VASSAL G. ET AL, "Busulfan disposition and hepatic veno-occlusive disease in children undergoing bone marrow transplantation", CANCER, CHEMOTHERAPY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 37, pages 247 - 253, XP008059483 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00688324 | Examination | - EREZ AYELET ET AL, "Requirement of argininosuccinate lyase for systemic nitric oxide production.", NATURE MEDICINE DEC 2011, (201112), vol. 17, no. 12, ISSN 1546-170X, pages 1619 - 1626 | - DHANAKOTI S N ET AL, "RENAL ARGININE SYNTHESIS STUDIES IN-VITRO AND IN-VIVO", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 259, no. 3 PART 1, ISSN 0002-9513, pages E437 - E442, XP008183898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpendo.1990.259.3.E437 |