EP1722743 - A MILD BODY WASH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Julie, Ann 2209 Woodacre Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45231 / US | 02 /
WEI, Karl, Shiqing 4600 Cobblestone Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 03 /
SMITH III, Edward, Dewey 6880 Man-O-War Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | L'Huillier, Florent Charles, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05724021.0 | 25.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US06388 | Priority number, date | US20040548738P | 27.02.2004 Original published format: US 548738 P | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005084615 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722743 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILDES KÖRPERWASCHMITTEL | [2006/47] | English: | A MILD BODY WASH | [2006/47] | French: | SAVON LIQUIDE DOUX POUR LE CORPS | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/08] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5556628 (DERIAN PAUL-JOEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 64 * * column 4, line 1 - line 9 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9904751 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 1, paragraphs 1,5 * * page 2, line 22 - page 13, line 25 * * example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO2005009385 (RHODIA [US]) [PX] 1-16 * page 1, line 17 - page 5, line 21 * * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 16 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 21 * * claims 1,8,9,11-16,18,26 * | [L] - LEVER, "Dove All Day Moisturizing Body Wash", pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.ewg.org/reports/skindeep/productinfo.php?prod_id=901910, (20050621), XP002332778 [L] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - PROCTER & GAMBLE, "Olay Daily Renewal Moisturizing Body Wash", (19990901), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://householdproducts.nlm.nih.gov/cgi-bin/household/brands?tbl=brands&id=16003084, (20050620), XP002332779 [X] 1-16 * page 2; example . * |