EP1763395 - FILTRATION DEVICES WITH EMBEDDED RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION (RFID) TAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRANAUTICS 401 Jones Road Oceanside, CA 92054 / US | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2009/47] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states HYDRANAUTICS 401 Jones Road Oceanside, CA 92054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEYAMA, Norio 2180 Palmer Drive Oceanside, California 92056 / US | 02 /
WILF, Mark 6204 Syracuse Lane San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Lüdcke, Joachim Moritz, et al Patentanwalt Kamper Strasse 1 51789 Lindlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Lüdcke, Joachim Moritz, et al Kamper Strasse 1 51789 Lindlar / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 05724483.2 | 04.03.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005US06945 | Priority number, date | US20040795138 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: US 795138 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005091959 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763395 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763395 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/12, B01D63/10, B01D63/12, B01D35/143 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
B01D35/143 (EP,US);
B01D61/10 (EP,US);
B01D61/12 (EP,US);
B01D63/107 (EP,US);
B01D63/12 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | B01D61/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2007/24] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FILTRIERUNGSEINRICHTUNGEN MIT EINGEBETTETEN ETIKETTEN ZUR HOCHFREQUENZIDENTIFIKATION (RFID) | [2007/12] | English: | FILTRATION DEVICES WITH EMBEDDED RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION (RFID) TAGS | [2007/12] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE FILTRATION AVEC ETIQUETTES D'IDENTIFICATION PAR RADIO-FREQUENCE INTEGREES | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19627595 (PALL CORP [US]); | [Y]DE20104481U (ULTRAFILTER INTERNAT AG [DE]); | [Y]US6558444 (HUNTER SUSANNE PHYLLIS [GB]) | International search | [Y]US5108604 (ROBBINS ADAM [US]); | [Y]US6224767 (FUJIWARA KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]DE10160429 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) |