EP1722937 - SHAVING RAZORS AND SHAVING CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2012/23] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Vincent, P. 20 Twinbrook Drive Bridgewater, MA 02324 / US | 02 /
CORBEIL, Corey, E. 91 Richie Road Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | 03 /
RAWLE, Stephen Willow tree Cottage Weston, Newbury Berkshire RG20 8JS / GB | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Chandrani, Vandita, et al Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Chandrani, Vandita, et al Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st floor, Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2006/47] | Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis, et al Howrey Simon Arnold & White Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 05724916.1 | 08.03.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US07478 | Priority number, date | US20040799946 | 11.03.2004 Original published format: US 799946 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005090015 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1722937 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722937 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1722937 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/52, B26B21/22, B26B21/40 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B26B21/4012 (EP,US);
B26B21/40 (KR);
B26B21/08 (KR);
B26B21/22 (KR);
B26B21/225 (EP,US);
B26B21/4018 (EP,US);
B26B21/4031 (EP,US);
B26B21/4043 (EP,US);
B26B21/4068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | B26B21/00, B26B21/40, B26B21/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/48] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NASSRASIERER UND RASIEREINHEITEN | [2006/47] | English: | SHAVING RAZORS AND SHAVING CARTRIDGES | [2006/47] | French: | RASOIRS ET TETES DE RASAGE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2012
25.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE BIC-Violex S.A. Agiou Athanasiou 145 69 Anixi, Attiki / GR Opponent's representative Plasseraud IP, et al, et al 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2012
25.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE BIC-Violex S.A. Agiou Athanasiou 145 69 Anixi, Attiki / GR Opponent's representative Cabinet Plasseraud, et al, et al 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2012
25.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE BIC-Violex S.A. Agiou Athanasiou 145 69 Anixi, Attiki / GR Opponent's representative Chateau, Marielle Lisianne Martine, et al, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire FR-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | 24.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.09.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.10.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2005 | AT | 20.04.2011 | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | IE | 08.03.2012 | IT | 08.03.2012 | LU | 08.03.2012 | SE | 09.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2019/41] |
Former [2016/23] | HU | 08.03.2005 | |
AT | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
IT | 08.03.2012 | ||
LU | 08.03.2012 | ||
SE | 09.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 08.03.2005 | |
AT | 20.04.2011 | ||
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
IT | 08.03.2012 | ||
LU | 08.03.2012 | ||
SE | 09.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
IT | 08.03.2012 | ||
LU | 08.03.2012 | ||
SE | 09.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
IT | 08.03.2012 | ||
SE | 09.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 20.04.2011 | |
CY | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
PT | 22.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB568585 (HENRY CONRAD HEIDE) [A] 28 * page 2, line 93 - line 125 *; | [A]US5373638 (COFFIN DAVE [GB]) [A] 52,67 * column 1, line 14 - line 32; claim 10 ** column 3, line 23 - line 27 *; | [XAY]US6035537 (APPRILLE JR DOMENIC VINCENT [US], et al) [X] 30,34-38,40-43 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 67; figures 1-8 * [A] 52,67 [Y] 31; | [AY]US6276061 (ROZENKRANC MENACHEM [IL]) [A] 25,52,68,69 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 22; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 * [Y] 31; | [A]US6349471 (GRUSLIN MARC R [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 30 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2003088984 (BRANDT KLAUS [US], et al) [A] 52,67 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-2A *; | [XA]EP1340600 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [X] 1-6,8-12,28,29 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0021] - [0023] - [0033] , [0034]; figures 1-7 * [A] 7,13-27,30,52,67; | [A]EP1342541 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US2003208907 (BROWN WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 52,67 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US6035537 | US6276061 | US6349471 | US2003088984 | EP1340600 | Opposition | US4901437 | US5761814 | US6185823 | US6276061 | US6349471 | EP1340600 | EP1342541 | WO2005011930 |