EP1727854 - METHOD TO ADHERE AN EXPANDABLE FLEXIBLE POLYURETHANE TO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABAKOVIC, Rifat 113 Sandalwood Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US | 02 /
LEKOVIC, Huzeir 5920 Houghten Troy, MI 48098 / US | 03 /
BILLOTTO, Frank, Vincent 1777 Rochester Road Oakland Township, MI 48363 / US | 04 /
EL-KHATIB, Ali 7814 Theisen Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05725012.8 | 08.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005US07608 | Priority number, date | US20040553188P | 15.03.2004 Original published format: US 553188 P | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005090455 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1727854 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/04, C08J9/06, C08J9/10, C08G18/10, C08K5/23 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/36 (EP,US);
C08G18/409 (EP,US);
C08G18/4804 (EP,US);
C08G18/4841 (EP,US);
C08G18/6552 (EP,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G18/794 (EP,US);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08J9/06 (EP,US);
C08J9/103 (EP,US);
C09J175/04 (KR);
C09J5/00 (KR);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/005 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0058 (EP,US);
C08G2120/00 (EP,US);
C08G2150/60 (EP,US);
C08G2170/60 (EP,US);
C08G2350/00 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
C08J2375/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/4009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HAFTENDEN AUFBRINGEN EINES EXPANDIERBAREN WEICHEN POLYURETHANS AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2006/49] | English: | METHOD TO ADHERE AN EXPANDABLE FLEXIBLE POLYURETHANE TO A SUBSTRATE | [2006/49] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE ADHERER UN POLYURETHANNE FLEXIBLE EXPANSIBLE A UN SUBSTRAT | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0591766 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8 * column 2, line 6 - column 2, line 40 * * column 5, line 9 - column 5, line 23 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 27 * * examples 2-4 * * claims 1,7 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]JP2000219763 ; | [X]JPH101560 ; | [A]EP0526178 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 24 - page 3, line 48 * * page 5, line 26 - page 5, line 44 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0044821 (HUNTSMAN ICI CHEM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 25 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP1174459 (HUNTSMAN INT LLC [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0057] * * claims 1,7,8,19 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 65, Database accession no. 2000-667083, XP002330359 & JP2000219763 A 20000808 (KURARAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 11, Database accession no. 1998-114852, XP002330360 & JPH101560 A 19980106 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |