Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013236930 | ![]() | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53655106 | 28.09.2006 | US58602309 | 16.09.2009 | US7727205 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | US201313782973 | 01.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8389242 | ![]() | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2011059484 | 10.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53655106 | 28.09.2006 | US58602309 | 16.09.2009 | US7727205 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007026496 | ![]() | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53655106 | 28.09.2006 | US7727205 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7294483 | ![]() | 13.11.2007 | B2 | US2005244927 | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7727205 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101210083B | ![]() | 07.12.2012 | B1 | KR20070029144 | 13.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5014116B | ![]() | 29.08.2012 | B2 | JP2007537725 | 27.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2558911 | ![]() | 06.12.2016 | C | CA2558911 | 22.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005222397 | ![]() | 22.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1733037 | ![]() | 05.11.2014 | B1 | EP1733037 | 20.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0507233 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0507233 | 23.01.2018 | B1 | BRPI0507233 | 26.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2946323 | 22.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2558911 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1954074B | 24.08.2011 | B | CN1954074 | 25.04.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116010T | 25.01.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05725198 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1733037T | 12.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2527291T | 22.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1103761 | 28.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150077T | 10.04.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | EP05725198 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME02058 | 20.05.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | EP05725198 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ549266 | 31.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1733037T | 30.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | EP05725198 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS53774 | 30.06.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1733037T | 27.02.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US07880 | 10.03.2005 | EP05725198 | 10.03.2005 | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005087802 | ![]() | 02.03.2006 | A3 | WO2005087802 | 22.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1733037E | 05.02.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2433185 | 10.11.2011 | C2 | RU2006135933 | 20.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200606913 | 26.03.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US55267804 | 11.03.2004 |