03.06.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.02.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.09.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
24.09.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
09.10.2009 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
07.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2009 |
Publication of international search report |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
25.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
13.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
10.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|