Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1735830 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2010 | A4 | EP1735830 | 27.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US08067 | 09.03.2005 | US70893504 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005104231 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A3 | WO2005104231 | 03.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70893504 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7064963 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2006 | B2 | US2005218505 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70893504 | 01.04.2004 |