EP1730935 - MANAGING DATA REPLICATION POLICIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NetApp, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states NetApp, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states NETWORKAPPLIANCE, INC. 495 East Java Avenue Sunnyvale California 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Sahn 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
FONG, Yinfung 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2014/19] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road GB-London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05725424.5 | 11.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005US08234 | Priority number, date | US20040798991 | 12.03.2004 Original published format: US 798991 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005091598 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1730935 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/24 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/5682 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON DATENWIEDERHERSTELLUNGSREGELN | [2006/50] | English: | MANAGING DATA REPLICATION POLICIES | [2006/50] | French: | GESTION DE POLICES DE DUPLICATION DE DONNEES | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 16.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6345294 (O'TOOLE JAMES [US], et al) [A] 8,12* column 5, line 42 - line 45 *; | [X]US2003154238 (MURPHY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]US2003158920 (LYNCH AMY ELIZABETH [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0064] * |