EP1725920 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A ROAD TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄMMERLING, Carsten Silcherstrasse 6 71139 Ehningen / DE | 02 /
HEILMANN, Harro Helene-Lange-Strasse 40 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 03 /
RENNER, Frank Spitzäckerstrasse 56 70794 Filderstadt / DE | 04 /
SCHWARZHAUPT, Andreas Lindenbergstrasse 30 76829 Landau / DE | 05 /
SPIEGELBERG, Gernot Blossenbergstrasse 44 71296 Heimsheim / DE | 06 /
SULZMANN, Armin Dantestr. 31 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
HÄMMERLING, Carsten Silcherstrasse 6 71139 Ehningen / DE | ||
02 /
HEILMANN, Harro Helene-Lange-Strasse 40 73760 Ostfildern / DE | |||
03 /
RENNER, Frank Spitzäckerstrasse 56 70794 Filderstadt / DE | |||
04 /
SCHWARZHAUPT, Andreas Lindenbergstrasse 30 76829 Landau / DE | |||
05 /
SPIEGELBERG, Gernot Blossenbergstrasse 44 71296 Heimsheim / DE | |||
06 /
SULZMANN, Armin Plankstadter Strasse 18 68723 Oftersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05726239.6 | 22.02.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005EP01808 | Priority number, date | DE20041009465 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: DE102004009465 | [2006/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006094519 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1725920 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B62D13/06 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B62D13/06 (EP,US);
B60G17/0195 (KR);
B60R16/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN GESPANN | [2006/48] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A ROAD TRAIN | [2006/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR UN TRAIN ROUTIER | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 27.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE10032179 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2004102297 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AP]EP1480097 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A] - DIVELBISS A W ET AL, "TRAJECTORY TRACKING CONTROL OF A CAR-TRAILER SYSTEM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONTROL SYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199705), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1063-6536, pages 269 - 278, XP000656533 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/87.572125 | by applicant | DE10032179 |