EP1713680 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING THE STEERING OF STEERED WHEELS OF A VEHICLE THUS EQUIPPED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2008/14] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUQUEUX, Olivier 3, rue des Sycomores F-78600 Mesnil Le Roi / FR | 02 /
AUVINET, Jannick 19, A rue de Coudres F-27000 Evreux / FR | [2006/43] | Application number, filing date | 05726344.4 | 04.02.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005FR50069 | Priority number, date | FR20040001180 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: FR 0401180 | [2006/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075277 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713680 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1713680 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
B62D6/002 (EP,US);
B62D5/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | B62D6/00, // B62D113/00, B62D117/00, B62D137/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER LENKUNG VON GELENKTEN RÄDERN EINES SO AUSGESTATTETEN FAHRZEUGS | [2006/43] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING THE STEERING OF STEERED WHEELS OF A VEHICLE THUS EQUIPPED | [2006/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'AIDE AU BRAQUAGE DE ROUES DIRECTRICES DE VEHICULE AINSI EQUIPE | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | NL | 02.04.2008 | PL | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
GR | 03.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
GR | 03.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4120069 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,6-8 * column A * * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 12 * * column 5, line 54 - column 8, line 25 * * claims 1-4,8,9 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 2,9,10; | [A]WO03022648 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) | by applicant | US5884724 |