25.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
23.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
29.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
11.07.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
29.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
15.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
03.08.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
28.04.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.04.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.04.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
24.03.2007 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
02.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
22.09.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
29.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|