Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1713624 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | EP1713624 | 25.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004006913 | 12.02.2004 | WO2005EP50588 | 10.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005001424D1 | 18.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004006913 | 12.02.2004 | WO2005EP50588 | 10.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005077609 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004006913 | 12.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE372190T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004006913 | 12.02.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004006913 | 08.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004006913 | 12.02.2004 |