EP1717890 - ALKALINE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industries Co., Ltd. 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMAMURA, Harunari c/o Matsushita Electric Indunstrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMURA, Koshi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
KOSHIBA, Nobuharu c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
SHIMAMURA, H. c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd IP Devel. Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7 Shiromi 1-ch., Chuo-ku Osaka 5406319 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAMURA K. c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd IP Devel. Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7 Shiromi 1-ch., Chuo-ku Osaka 5406319 / JP | |||
03 /
KOSHIBA, N. c/o Matsushita Electric Ind. Co. Ltd IP Devel. Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7 Shiromi 1-ch., Chuo-ku Osaka 5406319 / JP | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | O'Brien, Simon Warwick, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Bradley, Josephine Mary D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05726651.2 | 17.03.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005JP04782 | Priority number, date | JP20040143430 | 13.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004143430 | [2006/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005112155 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717890 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/04, H01M6/06, H01M4/24 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H01M6/06 (EP,US);
H01M4/244 (EP,US);
H01M6/04 (EP,US);
H01M6/045 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0085 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/44] | H01M6/06, H01M4/06, H01M4/42, H01M4/62, H01M12/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/34] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKALIBATTERIE | [2006/44] | English: | ALKALINE BATTERY | [2006/44] | French: | BATTERIE ALCALINE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2006 | Translation filed | 09.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2004082093 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,5 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 23 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 1 *; | [E]WO2005064709 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [E] 1,5* page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 17 * | International search | [A]JPH05135776 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JP2002501287 ; | [A]JP2004014306 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) |