Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
10.11.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.07.2011 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.07.2011 | Change - classification | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.07.2011 | Change - classification | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
04.04.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
11.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.03.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.06.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
16.02.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
16.02.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
13.02.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.12.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.12.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.11.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.11.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |