EP1729028 - PARKING BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/49] | PARKING BRAKE DEVICE | ||
[2012/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | For all designated states Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd. 840, Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken 386-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd. 840, Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken 386-8505 / JP | |||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken 386-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAGAKI, Hiromi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | 02 /
WATADA, Akifumi c/o Nissin Kogyo Co.,Ltd. 840, Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano 3868505 / JP | [2012/09] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
INAGAKI, Hiromi, K K Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 3510193 / JP | ||
02 /
WATADA, Akifumi, Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano 3868505 / JP | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/49] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05727432.6 | 28.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005JP05732 | Priority number, date | JP20040093558 | 26.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004093558 | [2006/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005093281 | Date: | 06.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1729028 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1729028 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/18 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
B60T13/22 (EP,US);
B60T8/4872 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
B60T8/32 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2121/12 (EP,US);
F16D2123/00 (EP,US);
F16D2125/66 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/49] | F16D65/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/27] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FESTSTELLBREMSSYSTEM | [2012/11] | English: | PARKING BRAKE SYSTEM | [2012/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT | [2012/11] |
Former [2006/49] | FESTSTELLBREMSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2006/49] | PARKING BRAKE DEVICE | ||
Former [2006/49] | DISPOSITIF DE FREIN DE STATIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2006 | Translation filed | 19.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.06.2012 | [2013/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2005093282 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1* abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5352869 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE GMBH); | [A]JPS5435565 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPS5460174U ; | [A]JPS6237531 (POCLAIN HYDRAULICS SA); | [A]JP2003014015 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND); | [A]JPS54142770U ; | [A]JPS56141207U ; | [A]JPH02134406 (LATCHWAYS LTD); | [A]JPS6325809U ; | [A]JPH10512947 ; | [A]JP2000504811 ; | [XE]WO2005033541 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) |