EP1723351 - HYDROKINETIC COUPLING DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Embrayages 81 avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Valeo Embrayages 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80000 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states VALEO EMBRAYAGES 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80000 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARHAB, Rabah 45 rue des Ecoles F-95350 Saint Brice sous Forêt / FR | 02 /
TERMENON, Norberto 2 rue Turpin F-80000 Amiens / FR | [2006/47] | Application number, filing date | 05728083.6 | 28.02.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005FR50130 | Priority number, date | FR20040050422 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0450422 | [2006/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005085678 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1723351 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723351 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H41/24, F16H45/02, B23K20/12 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F16H45/02 (EP,US);
B23K20/12 (EP,US);
F16H41/28 (EP,US);
F16H2045/0294 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROKINETISCHE KUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2006/47] | English: | HYDROKINETIC COUPLING DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2006/47] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACCOUPLEMENT HYDROCINETIQUE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2008 | CY | 11.06.2008 | CZ | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | IE | 11.06.2008 | IT | 11.06.2008 | LT | 11.06.2008 | NL | 11.06.2008 | PL | 11.06.2008 | RO | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | ES | 22.09.2008 | IS | 11.10.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | BE | 28.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | GB | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | LU | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
LU | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
LU | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
GB | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5533602 (WOERNER OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 10 - column 5, line 33; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2732427 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4345399 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US6439361 (MAIENSCHEIN STEPHAN [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 16, line 33 - column 16, line 44; figures 3,8 *; | [A]US6695109 (WACK ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 53-56; figure 1 * |