EP1737374 - BLOOD VESSEL HOLDING AND POSITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway, Northeast MS LC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | ||
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway, MSLC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLIG, Christopher, P. 7000 Sleepy Hollow Lane Edin Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | 02 /
GUENST, Gary, W. 812 Hidden Forrest Drive Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05728258.4 | 17.03.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005US08846 | Priority number, date | US20040804391 | 18.03.2004 Original published format: US 804391 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005089665 | Date: | 29.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1737374 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/30 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00778 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM HALTEN UND POSITIONIEREN VON BLUTGEFÄSSEN | [2007/01] | English: | BLOOD VESSEL HOLDING AND POSITIONING SYSTEM | [2007/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE MAINTIEN ET DE MISE EN PLACE DE VAISSEAUX SANGUINS | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2002360593 ; | [X]US3361133 (KIMBERLEY HENRY J, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US3561448 (PETERNEL JACOB) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11,13-15,17,24,25,27-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US3786817 (PALMA J) [X] 1,2,5,8-11,14,17,24,28-30* the whole document * | [XI] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030402), vol. 2003, no. 04, & JP2002360593 A 20021217 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CORP) [X] 1,4-6,8-10,13-15,17 * abstract * [I] 7,16 | by applicant | US3561448 | US6565527 |