EP1796204 - HIGH FREQUENCY COUPLER, HIGH FREQUENCY TANSMITTER AND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hata, Hiroshi 5-9-20, Uematsu Nagano-shi, Nagano 380-0802 / JP | For all designated states Karakama, Takahisa c/o KABUSHIKIGAISYA FEIBARAITSU 2558-6, Oaza Nakano Nakano-shi, Nagano 383-0013 / JP | For all designated states Higuchi, Toshiaki C/o KABUSHIKIGAISYA FEIBARAITSU 2558-6, Oaza Nakano Nakano-shi, Nagano 383-0013 / JP | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATA, Hiroshi 5-9-20, Uematsu, Nagano-shi, Nagano 3800802 / JP | 02 /
KARAKAMA, Takahisa, KABUSHIKIGAISYA FEIBARAITSU 2558-6, Oaza Nakano Nakano-shi, Nagano 383-0013 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05728482.0 | 07.04.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005JP06842 | Priority number, date | JP20040247822 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004247822 | [2007/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006022046 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796204 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/10, H01P5/18 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H01P5/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01P5/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZKOPPLER, HOCHFREQUENZSENDER UND ANTENNE | [2007/24] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY COUPLER, HIGH FREQUENCY TANSMITTER AND ANTENNA | [2007/24] | French: | COUPLEUR HAUTE FREQUENCE, EMETTEUR ET ANTENNE HAUTE FREQUENCE | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2007 | Translation filed | 23.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 22.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/16] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4737797 (SIWIAK KAZIMIERZ [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column W *; | [A]US4847626 (KAHLER MARK P [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 53 * * column 5, lines 59-64; figures 2A,2B *; | [A]US5121090 (GARUTS VALDIS E [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 1, lines 20-25 ** column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 2; figures 4a,10 *; | [A]EP0539133 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 25-34; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0641037 (HITACHI FERRITE LTD [JP]) [X] 7-9 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US5497137 (FUJIKI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 12-67; figures 2,19 *; | [XY]EP0866513 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-5 * column 5, lines 34-43; figure 8a * [Y] 6; | [X]US6396362 (MOURANT JEAN-MARC [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 22; figures 2A,2B * | International search | [X]JPH03237801 (MOTOROOLA SEMIKONDAKUTOUULE BO); | [X]JPH11214943 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [Y]JP2001127650 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [A]JP2003069360 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2004023243 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |