EP1739100 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLUORINE-CONTAINING ELASTOMER POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUDA, Nobuhiko, DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 56685 85 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Yoshiki, DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 56685 85 / JP | 03 /
MORITA, Shigeru, DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 56685 85 / JP | 04 /
SAWADA, Yasuhiko, DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 56685 85 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Tetsuo, DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Yodogawa Plant. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 56685 85 / JP | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05728782.3 | 05.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005JP06678 | Priority number, date | JP20040113684 | 07.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004113684 | JP20040270481 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004270481 | [2007/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005097836 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739100 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/26, C08F2/38, C08F214/18, C08F216/14, C08F14/26, // C08F14/18 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
C08F14/26 (EP,US);
C08F14/18 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/18, C08F2/16 (EP,US);
C08F14/18, C08F2/22 (US,EP);
C08F14/18, C08F2/24 (US,EP);
C08F14/26, C08F2/22 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2007/01] | C08F2/26, C08F2/38, C08F214/18, C08F216/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLUORHALTIGEM ELASTOMERPOLYMER | [2007/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLUORINE-CONTAINING ELASTOMER POLYMER | [2007/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN POLYMERE ELASTOMERE FLUORE | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2006 | Translation filed | 03.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 08.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0728776 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * example 11 *; | [A]EP1153946 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [E]WO2005097836 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO9533782 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO0001741 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPS6133848B |