Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
18.09.2009 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
18.09.2009 | Change - classification | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
04.05.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
03.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.06.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
08.05.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.12.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.12.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
01.12.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
30.11.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.11.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.11.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.10.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |