Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007208131 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004113684 | 07.04.2004 | WO2005JP06678 | 05.04.2005 | JP2004270481 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1739100 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2009 | A4 | EP1739100 | 03.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004113684 | 07.04.2004 | WO2005JP06678 | 05.04.2005 | JP2004270481 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1938337 | 28.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004113684 | 07.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005097836 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004113684 | 07.04.2004 | JP2004270481 | 16.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005320501 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004113684 | 07.04.2004 | JP2004270481 | 16.09.2004 |